LA SB699 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Effective date 7/8/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Effective date 7/8/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes public entities to create public benefit corporations for financing arrangements regarding public property. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE FF RV)
Title
Authorizes public entities to create public benefit corporations for financing arrangements regarding public property. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE FF RV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 699, CONCUR (#1820) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 699, FINAL PASSAGE (#1564) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 699, FINAL PASSAGE (#858) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 699, FINAL PASSAGE (#1564) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 699, FINAL PASSAGE (#858) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Effective date 7/8/10. | |
2010-07-08 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1009. | |
2010-06-21 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/22. | |
2010-06-20 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-20 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-18 | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2010-06-16 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2010-06-16 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010. | |
2010-06-08 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-06-07 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-06-04 | Reported favorably (15-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-03 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2010-06-02 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-06-01 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-25 | Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-24 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-05-11 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | |
2010-05-10 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-04-14 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |