LA SB696 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Effective date 7/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Effective date 7/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to signature required on certain checks issued by the Senate. (7/1/12)
Title
Provides relative to signature required on certain checks issued by the Senate. (7/1/12)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 696, FINAL PASSAGE (#1471) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 696, FINAL PASSAGE (#1374) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 696, FINAL PASSAGE (#1374) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-14 | Effective date 7/1/12. | |
2012-06-14 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 847. | |
2012-06-04 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-06-03 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-03 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-06-01 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-06-01 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-31 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012. | |
2012-05-31 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-30 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-30 | Reported favorably (9-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-05-24 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-05-24 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-23 | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-03 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |