LA SB69 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the crime of aggravated distribution of a controlled dangerous substance. (gov sig) (EGF INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the crime of aggravated distribution of a controlled dangerous substance. (gov sig) (EGF INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Beth Mizell [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 69 AMENDMENT # 3914 BY MARINO MOTION TO ADOPT (#1049) (Y: 43 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 69 FINAL PASSAGE (#190) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 69 FINAL PASSAGE (#190) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2021-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2021. |
2021-06-03 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. |
2021-06-03 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2021-06-02 | House | Reported with amendments (8-3-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2021-04-29 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |