LA SB69 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Effective date 6/27/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Effective date 6/27/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Northshore Technical Community College. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Title
Creates the Northshore Technical Community College. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Nevers [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - House - House Vote on SB 69, FINAL PASSAGE (#782) (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 69, SB 69 BY NEVERS (#56) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 69, SB 69 BY NEVERS (#56) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Effective date 6/27/11. | |
2011-06-27 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 209. | |
2011-06-22 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2011-06-21 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-21 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-20 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2011-06-20 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 9. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-20 | Called from the calendar. | |
2011-06-19 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011. | |
2011-06-19 | Notice given. | |
2011-06-19 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2011-06-16 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/19/2011. | |
2011-06-16 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-15 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2011-06-14 | Reported favorably (24-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-09 | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2011-06-08 | Reported favorably (11-0) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2011-05-05 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2011-05-04 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2011-05-04 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-03 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-02 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-04-25 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Education. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Education. |