LA SB67 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 73-31)
Status: Passed on May 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Effective date 8/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 73-31)
Status: Passed on May 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Effective date 8/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Designates a portion of Interstate 55 in Tangipahoa Parish as the "Trooper Hung Le Memorial Highway". (8/1/24) (EN +$3,360 SG EX See Note)
Title
Designates a portion of Interstate 55 in Tangipahoa Parish as the "Trooper Hung Le Memorial Highway". (8/1/24) (EN +$3,360 SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - House - House Vote on SB 67 FINAL PASSAGE (#814) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 67 CO-AUTHORS (#48) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 67 FINAL PASSAGE (#47) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 67 CO-AUTHORS (#48) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 67 FINAL PASSAGE (#47) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2024. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 51. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2024-05-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2024-05-01 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 103, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-05-01 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2024-04-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/2024. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-16 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-03-21 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-03-20 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |