LA SB67 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 8/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 8/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the reorganization and modernization of the Administrative Procedure Act. (8/1/22) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides for the reorganization and modernization of the Administrative Procedure Act. (8/1/22) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 67 CONCUR (#1265) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 67 FINAL PASSAGE (#1405) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 67 FINAL PASSAGE (#195) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 67 FINAL PASSAGE (#1405) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 67 FINAL PASSAGE (#195) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-18 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2022. |
2022-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 663. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2022-06-02 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2022. |
2022-05-23 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-19 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-18 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-04-12 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |