LA SB669 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide with respect to eye or vision care services provided by choice of practitioners under medical eye care or vision care benefit plans. (8/1/12) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provide with respect to eye or vision care services provided by choice of practitioners under medical eye care or vision care benefit plans. (8/1/12) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 669, CONCUR (#1676) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 669, FINAL PASSAGE (#1423) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 669, AMENDMENT # 526 BY SEABAUGH, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1422) (Y: 5 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 669, FINAL PASSAGE (#584) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 669, FINAL PASSAGE (#1423) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 669, AMENDMENT # 526 BY SEABAUGH, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1422) (Y: 5 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 669, FINAL PASSAGE (#584) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-14 | Effective date 8/1/12. | |
2012-06-14 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 843. | |
2012-06-04 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-06-03 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-03 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-06-01 | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 1 nays. | |
2012-06-01 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2012-05-31 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 2. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-24 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/31/2012. | |
2012-05-24 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-23 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-22 | Reported favorably (11-1) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-01 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2012-04-30 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-04-30 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-26 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-25 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-04-03 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2012-04-02 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |