LA SB66 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Effective date 8/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Effective date 8/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Enhances penalties for violation of a protective order when committed while in possession of a firearm. (8/1/22) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Enhances penalties for violation of a protective order when committed while in possession of a firearm. (8/1/22) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - House - House Vote on SB 66 FINAL PASSAGE (#949) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 66 CO-AUTHORS (#63) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 66 FINAL PASSAGE (#62) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 66 CO-AUTHORS (#63) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 66 FINAL PASSAGE (#62) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2022. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 75. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/20/2022. |
2022-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-05-18 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2022. |
2022-05-09 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-05 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-04 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-03-29 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-03-28 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |