LA SB66 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-22 - Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-22 - Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires verification of legal work status of employees by private employers seeking to contract with state agencies. (8/15/11) (REF NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Title
Requires verification of legal work status of employees by private employers seeking to contract with state agencies. (8/15/11) (REF NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. James Armes [D] | Rep. Damon Baldone [D] | Rep. Henry Burns [R] | Sen. Sherri Cheek [R] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D] | Rep. Mickey Guillory [D] | Rep. John Guinn [R] |
Rep. Walker Hines [D] | Rep. Frank Howard [R] | Rep. Nita Hutter [R] | Rep. Kay Katz [R] |
Rep. Samuel Little [R] | Rep. Jack Montoucet [D] | Rep. Rickey Nowlin [R] | Sen. Rogers Pope [R] |
Rep. Neil Riser [R] | Sen. Gary Smith [D] | Rep. Jane Smith [R] | Rep. Karen St Germain [D] |
Sen. Kirk Talbot [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 66, REJECT (#604) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - House - House Vote on SB 66, FINAL PASSAGE (#600) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 66, FINAL PASSAGE (#210) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 66, AMENDMENT # 1224 BY CLAITOR, #2 (#209) (Y: 2 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2011-06-14 - House - House Vote on SB 66, FINAL PASSAGE (#600) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 66, FINAL PASSAGE (#210) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 66, AMENDMENT # 1224 BY CLAITOR, #2 (#209) (Y: 2 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-22 | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2011-06-22 | House conferees appointed: Edwards, Hutter, and Henry. | |
2011-06-21 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2011-06-21 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Riser, Appel, and Claitor. | |
2011-06-15 | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. | |
2011-06-15 | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending. | |
2011-06-14 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2011-06-14 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-13 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2011. | |
2011-06-08 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/13/2011. | |
2011-06-08 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-07 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2011-06-06 | Reported with amendments (14-0-1) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-05-23 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2011-05-19 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2011-05-18 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-17 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-16 | Reported with amendments. | |
2011-04-25 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |