LA SB65 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Effective date 8/1/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Effective date 8/1/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the New Orleans Aviation Board to use the construction manager at risk method. (8/1/13)
Title
Authorizes the New Orleans Aviation Board to use the construction manager at risk method. (8/1/13)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 65 CONCUR (#598) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 65 FINAL PASSAGE (#552) (Y: 74 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 65 FINAL PASSAGE (#152) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 65 FINAL PASSAGE (#552) (Y: 74 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 65 FINAL PASSAGE (#152) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2013. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 119. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-05-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2013-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 18. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on May 22, 2013. |
2013-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-13 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-04-29 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2013-04-25 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 2 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |