LA SB65 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the inclusion of all or any portions of Ascension or Iberville parishes in the inland boundary of the coastal zone.
Title
Authorizes the inclusion of all or any portions of Ascension or Iberville parishes in the inland boundary of the coastal zone.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Amedee [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on SB 65, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1967) (Y: 70 N: 17 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 65, ADOPT (#2000) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 65, REJECT (#1932) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 65, FINAL PASSAGE (#1725) (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 65, FINAL PASSAGE (#476) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 65, ADOPT (#2000) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 65, REJECT (#1932) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 65, FINAL PASSAGE (#1725) (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 65, FINAL PASSAGE (#476) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Effective date 8/15/10. | |
2010-07-06 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 956. | |
2010-06-21 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/23. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-21 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/22/10. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. | |
2010-06-21 | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 70, nays 17. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. | |
2010-06-21 | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2010-06-20 | House conferees appointed: Lambert, Dove, and Smiley. | |
2010-06-20 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2010-06-20 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Amedee, Marionneaux, and Gautreaux, N.. | |
2010-06-20 | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. | |
2010-06-20 | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending. | |
2010-06-18 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2010-06-17 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 2. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-06-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/17/2010. | |
2010-06-15 | Notice given. | |
2010-06-15 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-06-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/15/2010. | |
2010-06-07 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-06-04 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-06-03 | Reported with amendments (12-4) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-06 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |
2010-05-05 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-05-04 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 2 nays, ordered reengrossed, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-04 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-05-03 | The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2010-05-03 | Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. | |
2010-05-03 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-04-14 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2010-04-13 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-04-12 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Natural Resources. | |
2010-03-10 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Natural Resources. |