LA SB63 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Effective date 7/1/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Effective date 7/1/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes each assessor to increase his compensation by up to 4% each calendar year for four years beginning 2013. (7/1/13) (EN +$1,202,449 LF EX See Note)
Title
Authorizes each assessor to increase his compensation by up to 4% each calendar year for four years beginning 2013. (7/1/13) (EN +$1,202,449 LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 63 CONCUR (#811) (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 63 FINAL PASSAGE (#699) (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 63 FINAL PASSAGE (#398) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 63 FINAL PASSAGE (#699) (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 63 FINAL PASSAGE (#398) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2013. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 372. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 22 yeas and 8 nays. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2013-05-30 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 36. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on May 30, 2013. |
2013-05-28 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-23 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-22 | House | Reported with amendments (16-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-16 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-05-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 10 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |