LA SB61 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 28, nays 68. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 28, nays 68. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to authorize local economic development authorities or districts to enter into contracts to exempt offshore vessels from ad valorem taxation. (2/3 - CA13s1(A)) (RE1 SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Title
Constitutional amendment to authorize local economic development authorities or districts to enter into contracts to exempt offshore vessels from ad valorem taxation. (2/3 - CA13s1(A)) (RE1 SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 61 FINAL PASSAGE (#764) (Y: 28 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 61 FINAL PASSAGE (#273) (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 61 FINAL PASSAGE (#273) (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 28, nays 68. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. |
2017-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/17. |
2017-06-02 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-06-01 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2017-05-31 | House | Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-31 | House | Rules suspended. |
2017-05-31 | House | Read by title, amendments adopted. |
2017-05-30 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2017-05-15 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-05-11 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 4 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |