LA SB600 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Effective date 6/7/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Effective date 6/7/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the levy, collection, allocation, and use of certain taxes collected by the Vermilion Parish Tourist Commission. (gov sig)
Title
Provides for the levy, collection, allocation, and use of certain taxes collected by the Vermilion Parish Tourist Commission. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 600, CONCUR (#1703) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 600, FINAL PASSAGE (#1449) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 600, FINAL PASSAGE (#1248) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 600, FINAL PASSAGE (#1449) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 600, FINAL PASSAGE (#1248) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | Effective date 6/7/12. | |
2012-06-07 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 673. | |
2012-06-04 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-06-04 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-04 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-06-03 | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2012-06-01 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2012-06-01 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-31 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012. | |
2012-05-31 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent. | |
2012-05-31 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-31 | Reported favorably (9-0-1) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-23 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2012-05-22 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-05-22 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-21 | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | |
2012-03-02 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |