LA SB60 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-20-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective date 7/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-20-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective date 7/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the compensation of intercollegiate athletes for the use of their name, image, or likeness. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the compensation of intercollegiate athletes for the use of their name, image, or likeness. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 60 CONCUR (#983) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 60 FINAL PASSAGE (#1038) (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 60 CO-AUTHORS (#372) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 60 FINAL PASSAGE (#371) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 60 FINAL PASSAGE (#1038) (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 60 CO-AUTHORS (#372) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 60 FINAL PASSAGE (#371) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2021. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 479. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021. |
2021-06-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2021-06-07 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 7. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2021. |
2021-06-02 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-06-01 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2021-05-27 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-19 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2021-05-18 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |