LA SB60 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date 5/15/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date 5/15/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to civil actions for domestic abuse. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to civil actions for domestic abuse. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House Vote on SB 60 FINAL PASSAGE (#817) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 60 FINAL PASSAGE (#290) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 60 FINAL PASSAGE (#290) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Effective date 5/15/2018. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 228. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-08 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-25 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-24 | House | Reported favorably (6-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-04-10 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |