LA SB6 | 2016 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Effective date 6/28/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Effective date 6/28/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the carry forward rather than the refund of a certain portion of the tax credit for ad valorem taxes paid on inventory. (gov sig) (Item #47) (EN +$17,300,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for the carry forward rather than the refund of a certain portion of the tax credit for ad valorem taxes paid on inventory. (gov sig) (Item #47) (EN +$17,300,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 6 ADOPT (#84) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - House - House Vote on SB 6 MOTION TO ADOPT (#55) (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 6 REJECT (#64) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - House - House Vote on SB 6 FINAL PASSAGE (#39) (Y: 78 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 6 FINAL PASSAGE (#29) (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - House - House Vote on SB 6 MOTION TO ADOPT (#55) (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 6 REJECT (#64) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - House - House Vote on SB 6 FINAL PASSAGE (#39) (Y: 78 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 6 FINAL PASSAGE (#29) (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | Senate | Effective date 6/28/2016. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 4. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/24/2016. |
2016-06-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-06-23 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 9 nays. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-23 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 77, nays 21. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2016-06-23 | House | Rules suspended. |
2016-06-23 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2016-06-23 | House | House conferees appointed: Stokes, Abramson, and Barras. |
2016-06-22 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Martiny, and Alario. |
2016-06-22 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 34 yeas and 4 nays. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2016-06-20 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 18. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-20 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-06-20 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-06-20 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-06-20 | House | Rules suspended. |
2016-06-20 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2016-06-20 | House | Reported favorably (17-1-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-06-19 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2016-06-17 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 10 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |