LA SB56 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides right of an oral argument in contradictory proceedings. (gov sig)
Title
Provides right of an oral argument in contradictory proceedings. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 56 FINAL PASSAGE (#130) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2018-03-26 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-03-22 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |