LA SB558 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to incarcerated women. (8/1/18)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to incarcerated women. (8/1/18)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 558 CO-AUTHORS (#1086) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 558 CONCUR (#1085) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on SB 558 FINAL PASSAGE (#953) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 558 FINAL PASSAGE (#347) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-20SenateEffective date 8/1/2018.
2018-05-20SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 392.
2018-05-16SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-15SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-14SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
2018-05-11SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-05-10HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18.
2018-04-30HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-27HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-26HouseReported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2018-04-11HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-10SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-05SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-04SenateSubstitute for Senate Bill No. 374. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB558&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082806
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083093
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085096
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096652
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101161
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083294
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088744
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090776
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095600
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095726
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082807
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083441
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085235
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083715
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090781
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101176
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085052
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095614
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096537
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096540

Bill Comments

feedback