LA SB55 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to prescribers of controlled dangerous substances. (See Act) (EN +$78,781 SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to prescribers of controlled dangerous substances. (See Act) (EN +$78,781 SG EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 55 CONCUR (#661) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 55 FINAL PASSAGE (#607) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 55 FINAL PASSAGE (#88) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12SenateEffective date: See Act.
2017-06-12SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 76.
2017-06-05SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2017-06-04HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2017-06-03SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2017-06-02SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
2017-06-01SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2017-06-01HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2017-05-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/01/17.
2017-05-25HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-05-24HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2017-05-23HouseReported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-04-25HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2017-04-24HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2017-04-24SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-04-20SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-04-19SenateReported with amendments.
2017-04-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2017-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=SB55&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1027240
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1034298
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047657
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1051081
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1034051
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043931
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044150
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047271
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1027241
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1033966
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1034708
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1035193
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044151
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048174
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1051184
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1035268
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047084
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047396

Bill Comments

feedback