LA SB549 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for military surplus motor vehicles. (8/1/18)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for military surplus motor vehicles. (8/1/18)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 549 CONCUR (#1277) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 549 FINAL PASSAGE (#1194) (Y: 74 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 549 SB 549 BY HEWITT (#700) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01SenateEffective date 8/1/2018.
2018-06-01SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 675.
2018-05-18SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
2018-05-18HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-18SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-17SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays.
2018-05-16SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-05-16HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 9. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-16HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-05-16HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18.
2018-05-09HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-05-08HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-05-07HouseReported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-03HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2018-05-02HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-05-02SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-01SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-30SenateReported with amendments.
2018-04-04SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2018-04-03SenateRules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB549&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082360
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090704
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098534
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103666
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090017
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097794
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098312
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082362
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092207
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102282
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092692
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098197
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098471

Bill Comments

feedback