LA SB549 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Effective date 8/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to firefighters including minimum wages and the reinstatement, reemployment, and seniority of firefighters who retire due to injury. (8/1/14)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to firefighters including minimum wages and the reinstatement, reemployment, and seniority of firefighters who retire due to injury. (8/1/14)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 549 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1652) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 549 ADOPT (#1761) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 549 REJECT (#1538) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 549 FINAL PASSAGE (#1252) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 549 FINAL PASSAGE (#348) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-23SenateEffective date 8/1/2014.
2014-06-23SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 869.
2014-06-02SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/3/2014.
2014-06-02SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2014-06-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2014-06-02HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2014-06-02SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2014-06-02HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2014-06-02SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
2014-06-02HouseConference Committee report received.
2014-05-30SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2014-05-29HouseHouse conferees appointed: St. Germain, Badon, and Montoucet.
2014-05-29HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2014-05-29SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Gallot, Dorsey-Colomb, and Peacock.
2014-05-29HouseNotice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
2014-05-29SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
2014-05-28SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2014-05-27HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2014-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2014.
2014-05-12HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2014-05-08HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2014-05-07HouseReported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2014-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2014-04-09HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2014-04-09SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2014-04-09SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2014-04-02SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2014-04-01SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2014-03-31SenateReported with amendments.
2014-03-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2014-02-28SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=14rs&b=SB549&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=880923
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=886080
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=912605
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=916145
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=885590
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=902070
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=909124
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=880928
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=889712
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=912366
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=913281
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=892055
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=908952
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=910071
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=912406
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=912436

Bill Comments 750

feedback