LA SB549 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Effective date 5/31/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Effective date 5/31/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for appropriations from the St. Martin Parish Enterprise Fund to be made to the St. Martin Parish government for tourism and economic development. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT SD RV See Note)
Title
Provides for appropriations from the St. Martin Parish Enterprise Fund to be made to the St. Martin Parish government for tourism and economic development. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-23 - House - House Vote on SB 549, FINAL PASSAGE (#1113) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 549, FINAL PASSAGE (#297) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 549, FINAL PASSAGE (#297) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Effective date 5/31/12. | |
2012-05-31 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 367. | |
2012-05-29 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-05-29 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-28 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-28 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-05-23 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-16 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/23/2012. | |
2012-05-10 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-09 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-08 | Reported favorably (24-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-04-11 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2012-04-10 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-04-09 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-03 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-02 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | |
2012-03-02 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |