LA SB548 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date 5/15/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a pretrial diversion program for veterans diagnosed with posttraumatic stress disorder. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a pretrial diversion program for veterans diagnosed with posttraumatic stress disorder. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 548 CONCUR (#832) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Vote on SB 548 FINAL PASSAGE (#784) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 548 FINAL PASSAGE (#389) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateEffective date 5/15/2018.
2018-05-15SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 251.
2018-05-11SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-09HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-09SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-08SenateRules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays.
2018-05-07SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-05-07HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/07/18.
2018-04-23HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-19HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-18HouseReported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-16HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2018-04-13HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-12SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-11SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-10SenateReported with amendments.
2018-04-04SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2018-04-03SenateRules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB548&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082331
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084769
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085863
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094383
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1100128
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084728
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085210
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087964
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087604
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093934
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082333
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085684
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085899
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087973
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096241
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085849
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093717
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094208

Bill Comments

feedback