LA SB537 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to placements minor's funds from a judgment or settlement. (8/1/18)
Title
Provides relative to placements minor's funds from a judgment or settlement. (8/1/18)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 537 CONCUR (#1348) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 537 FINAL PASSAGE (#1276) (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 537 FINAL PASSAGE (#705) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 537 FINAL PASSAGE (#1276) (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 537 FINAL PASSAGE (#705) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2018. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 607. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-15 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-05-14 | House | Reported with amendments (6-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-05-07 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 24 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |