LA SB536 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-20 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 685.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-20 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 685.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for K-12 student data privacy. (8/1/14) (OR +$651,000 SD EX See Note)
Title
Provides for K-12 student data privacy. (8/1/14) (OR +$651,000 SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | Senate | Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 685. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Reported by substitute. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |