LA SB53 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Effective date 6/29/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Effective date 6/29/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Oak Island Neighborhood Improvement District within the parish of Orleans to levy and collect a parcel fee. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to the Oak Island Neighborhood Improvement District within the parish of Orleans to levy and collect a parcel fee. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 53 FINAL PASSAGE (#821) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 53 FINAL PASSAGE (#305) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 53 FINAL PASSAGE (#305) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-29 | Senate | Effective date 6/29/2015. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 247. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2015-06-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2015-06-07 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/07/2015. |
2015-06-03 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-06-02 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2015-06-01 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-05-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2015-05-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |