LA SB524 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes and provides for a prestige license plate for the Zulu Social Aid and Pleasure Club, Warren Easton High School and LSU School of Dentistry. (8/15/10)
Title
Establishes and provides for a prestige license plate for the Zulu Social Aid and Pleasure Club, Warren Easton High School and LSU School of Dentistry. (8/15/10)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 524, CONCUR (#1634) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 524, FINAL PASSAGE (#1308) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 524, FINAL PASSAGE (#193) (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 524, FINAL PASSAGE (#1308) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 524, FINAL PASSAGE (#193) (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Effective date 8/15/10. | |
2010-06-29 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 657. | |
2010-06-17 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-06-16 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-16 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-15 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays. | |
2010-06-11 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2010-06-09 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-04 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/9/2010. | |
2010-05-24 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-20 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-05-19 | Reported favorably (12-0-1) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-04-15 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2010-04-14 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-04-14 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-04-13 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-04-12 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |
2010-03-19 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |