LA SB512 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 50-30-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective date 6/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to school employee participation in student-initiated prayer. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to school employee participation in student-initiated prayer. (gov sig)

Sponsors

Sen. Ryan Gatti [R]Sen. John Alario [R]Sen. R Allain [R]Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D]
Sen. Patrick Cortez [R]Sen. James Fannin [R]Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R]Sen. Ronnie Johns [R]
Sen. Eddie Lambert [R]Sen. Gerald Long [R]Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]Sen. Daniel Martiny [R]
Sen. John Milkovich [D]Sen. Dan Morrish [R]Sen. Gary Smith [D]Sen. Francis Thompson [D]
Sen. Michael Walsworth [R]Rep. Mark Abraham [R]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]Rep. John Anders [D]
Rep. James Armes [D]Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]Rep. John Bagneris [D]Rep. Taylor Barras [R]
Rep. John Berthelot [R]Rep. Joseph Bouie [D]Rep. Terry Brown [I]Rep. Thomas Carmody [R]
Rep. Robert Carter [D]Rep. Stephen Carter [R]Rep. Charles Chaney [R]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]
Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]Rep. Franklin Foil [R]
Rep. A.B. Franklin [D]Rep. Randal Gaines [D]Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D]
Rep. Jeff Hall [D]Rep. Jimmy Harris [D]Rep. Lance Harris [R]Rep. Lowell Hazel [R]
Rep. Cameron Henry [R]Rep. Valarie Hodges [R]Rep. Frank Hoffmann [R]Rep. Paul Hollis [R]
Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. Frank Howard [R]Rep. Mike Huval [R]Rep. Barry Ivey [R]
Rep. Katrina Jackson [D]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]Rep. Robert Johnson [D]
Rep. Sam Jones [D]Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]Rep. Terry Landry [D]Rep. Bernard LeBas [D]
Rep. Walt Leger [D]Rep. Sherman Mack [R]Rep. Tanner Magee [R]Rep. Jack McFarland [R]
Rep. Blake Miguez [R]Rep. Gregory Miller [R]Rep. Barbara Norton [D]Rep. Kevin Pearson [R]
Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Rogers Pope [R]Rep. Steve Pylant [R]Rep. Eugene Reynolds [D]
Rep. Jerome Richard [I]Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. Robert Shadoin [R]Rep. Joseph Stagni [D]
Rep. Julie Stokes [R]Rep. Kirk Talbot [R]Rep. Polly Thomas [R]Rep. Malinda White [D]
Rep. Mark Wright [R]Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]

Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 512 ADOPT (#1407) (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 512 REJECT (#1273) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 512 FINAL PASSAGE (#1179) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 512 AMENDMENT # 4385 BY EDMONDS MOTION TO ADOPT (#1178) (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 512 CO-AUTHORS (#557) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 512 FINAL PASSAGE (#556) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01SenateEffective date 6/1/2018.
2018-06-01SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 673.
2018-05-18SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/23/2018.
2018-05-18HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House. (Received on 05/22/18.)
2018-05-18SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
2018-05-18SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 28 yeas and 1 nays.
2018-05-18SenateReconsidered the vote by which the amendments were rejected.
2018-05-18SenateRules suspended. Discharged from Conference Committee..
2018-05-18SenateNotice of change in House Conference Committee membership.
2018-05-18SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2018-05-18HouseNotice of change in House conferees: Shadoin,Nancy Landry, Edmonds.
2018-05-18HouseHouse conferees appointed: Shadoin, Nancy Landry, and Seabaugh.
2018-05-17HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2018-05-17SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Gatti, Morrish, and Milkovich.
2018-05-17SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 31 yeas and 1 nays.
2018-05-16SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-05-16HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18.
2018-05-11HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-05-10HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-05-08HouseReported favorably (10-4-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-27HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-04-26HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-26SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-24SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-23SenateReported with amendments.
2018-04-03SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-04-02SenateRules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB512&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1081432
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088712
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099636
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103664
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088400
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095501
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098344
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098085
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1081434
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089786
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102292
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090457
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090459
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098086
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098464
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099633

Bill Comments

feedback