LA SB51 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-14 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-14 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for immunizations, including the COVID-19 vaccine, to be administered by pharmacists. (See Act) (Item #40)
Title
Provides for immunizations, including the COVID-19 vaccine, to be administered by pharmacists. (See Act) (Item #40)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 51 FINAL PASSAGE (#84) (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-14 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Reconsidered. |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 18 yeas and 17 nays. |
2020-10-12 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |