LA SB503 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Effective date 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Effective date 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to actions of Joint Legislative Committee on the Budget relative to the forty-five day close period. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to actions of Joint Legislative Committee on the Budget relative to the forty-five day close period. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Mack White [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 503 CONCUR (#445) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 503 FINAL PASSAGE (#487) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 503 FINAL PASSAGE (#149) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 503 FINAL PASSAGE (#487) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 503 FINAL PASSAGE (#149) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Effective date 6/4/2020. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 48. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2020-05-27 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-27 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2020-05-27 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/20. |
2020-05-21 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-05-18 | House | Reported with amendments (16-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |