LA SB502 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to prescription for tuition fees. (8/1/18)
Title
Provides relative to prescription for tuition fees. (8/1/18)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 502 FINAL PASSAGE (#1193) (Y: 64 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 502 FINAL PASSAGE (#597) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 502 FINAL PASSAGE (#597) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2018. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 471. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 64, nays 20. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18. |
2018-05-09 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-08 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-05-07 | House | Reported favorably (6-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-02 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |