LA SB500 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the levy of local fees and taxes on certain non-gaming incentives or inducements granted by certain licensees. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the levy of local fees and taxes on certain non-gaming incentives or inducements granted by certain licensees. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Reese [R] | Rep. Mike Bayham [R] | Rep. Ken Brass [D] | Rep. Dewith Carrier [R] |
Rep. Michael Echols [R] | Rep. Julie Emerson [R] | Rep. Steven Jackson [D] | Rep. Mike Johnson [R] |
Rep. Charles Owen [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 500 CONCUR (#1391) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 500 FINAL PASSAGE (#1448) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 500 FINAL PASSAGE (#454) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 500 FINAL PASSAGE (#1448) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 500 FINAL PASSAGE (#454) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-11 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2024. |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 592. |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2024-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2024-05-28 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 3. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-05-28 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2024. |
2024-05-23 | House | Notice given. |
2024-05-23 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2024. |
2024-05-22 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-21 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-05-20 | House | Reported with amendments (16-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2024-05-01 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |