LA SB50 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the petition for incorporation. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the petition for incorporation. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 50 FINAL PASSAGE (#276) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19.
2019-05-21HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-20HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-16HouseReported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2019-05-07HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-05-07SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-07SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2019-05-01SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2019-04-30SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-29SenateReported favorably.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2019-03-22SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback