LA SB50 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date 7/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date 7/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to release of obligations of indebtedness by the Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to release of obligations of indebtedness by the Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on SB 50 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1091) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 50 ADOPT (#1076) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 50 REJECT (#1002) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 50 FINAL PASSAGE (#820) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 50 FINAL PASSAGE (#226) (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 50 ADOPT (#1076) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 50 REJECT (#1002) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 50 FINAL PASSAGE (#820) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 50 FINAL PASSAGE (#226) (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2015. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 445. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2015. |
2015-06-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/12/2015. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-11 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2015-06-11 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-11 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2015-06-10 | House | House conferees appointed: Moreno, Badon, and Leger. |
2015-06-09 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Murray, Dorsey-Colomb, and Claitor. |
2015-06-09 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2015-06-07 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/07/2015. |
2015-06-03 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-06-02 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2015-06-01 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-05-07 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2015-05-06 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 4 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |