LA SB5 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Effective date 7/13/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Effective date 7/13/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to promotional play wagers. (Item #36) (gov sig) (EN -$11,200,000 RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to promotional play wagers. (Item #36) (gov sig) (EN -$11,200,000 RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Ronnie Johns [R] | Sen. Gary Smith [D] | Rep. Wilford Carter [D] | Rep. Les Farnum [R] |
Rep. Randal Gaines [D] | Rep. Ed Larvadain [D] | Rep. Denise Marcelle [D] | Rep. Vincent Pierre [D] |
Rep. Troy Romero [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote on SB 5 FINAL PASSAGE (#104) (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 5 FINAL PASSAGE (#47) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 5 FINAL PASSAGE (#47) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Senate | Effective date 7/13/2020. |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 14. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-06-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-06-24 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 19. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-06-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/24/20. |
2020-06-23 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-06-23 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-06-23 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-06-22 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-06-18 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 8 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |