LA SB5 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts diapers and feminine hygiene products from sales and use tax. (1/1/21) (RRF -$14,500,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts diapers and feminine hygiene products from sales and use tax. (1/1/21) (RRF -$14,500,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 5 REJECT (#652) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 5 FINAL PASSAGE (#699) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 5 AMENDMENT # 3446 BY MORRIS JAY MOTION TO ADOPT (#698) (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 5 FINAL PASSAGE (#306) (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2019-06-05HouseHouse conferees appointed: Coussan, Abramson, and Jay Morris.
2019-06-03HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2019-06-03SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, LaFleur, and Donahue.
2019-06-02HouseNotice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
2019-05-31SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
2019-05-30SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2019-05-30HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19.
2019-05-22HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-21HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-20HouseReported with amendments (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-05-09HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-05-08SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 5 nays; ordered re-reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-08SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2019-05-01SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2019-04-30SenateRead by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-29SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2019-04-23SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2019-04-22SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2019-02-18SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB5&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1112710
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125969
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128623
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132859
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125929
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126192
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128141
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128827
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132747
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135045
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135513
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139492
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139667
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139964
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140088
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1112711
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122486
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126703
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128045
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129387
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129702
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132906
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135202
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135586
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132810
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139669
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140430

Bill Comments

feedback