LA SB5 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Effective date 6/10/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Effective date 6/10/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the payment of certain system administrative expenses. (6/10/16) (EN NO IMPACT APV)
Title
Provides for the payment of certain system administrative expenses. (6/10/16) (EN NO IMPACT APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-09 - House - House Vote on SB 5 FINAL PASSAGE (#664) (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 5 FINAL PASSAGE (#90) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 5 FINAL PASSAGE (#90) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | Effective date 6/10/2016. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 94. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2016-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2016-05-09 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2016. |
2016-05-03 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-02 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported favorably (6-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-03-31 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2016-03-30 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |