LA SB5 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-06 - By a vote of 56 yeas, 30 nays, not having received a two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 57th calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-06 - By a vote of 56 yeas, 30 nays, not having received a two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 57th calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to remove the mandatory retirement age of judges.
Title
Constitutional amendment to remove the mandatory retirement age of judges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - House - House Vote on SB 5 MOTION TO CONSIDER AFTER 57TH DAY (#927) (Y: 56 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 5 CONSIDER AFTER 57TH DAY (#916) (Y: 62 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 5 FINAL PASSAGE (#756) (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 5 AMENDMENT # 4115 BY EDWARDS MOTION TO ADOPT (#754) (Y: 42 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2013-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 5 AMENDMENT # 4111 BY MORRIS JAY MOTION TO ADOPT (#753) (Y: 28 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 5 FINAL PASSAGE (#257) (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 5 CONSIDER AFTER 57TH DAY (#916) (Y: 62 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 5 FINAL PASSAGE (#756) (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 5 AMENDMENT # 4115 BY EDWARDS MOTION TO ADOPT (#754) (Y: 42 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2013-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 5 AMENDMENT # 4111 BY MORRIS JAY MOTION TO ADOPT (#753) (Y: 28 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 5 FINAL PASSAGE (#257) (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | By a vote of 56 yeas, 30 nays, not having received a two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 57th calendar day. |
2013-06-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/6/2013. |
2013-06-05 | House | Notice given. |
2013-06-05 | House | By a vote of 62 yeas, 29 nays, not having received a two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 57th calendar day. |
2013-06-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/5/2013. |
2013-06-04 | House | Notice given. |
2013-06-04 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2013-06-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 63, nays 33. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending. |
2013-06-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-06-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/03/2013. |
2013-05-30 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-29 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-28 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-16 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported favorably (15-2) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2013-05-07 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2013-05-06 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 2 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |