LA SB489 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to limitation of liability of governmental entities which require its employees to work during a declared state of emergency. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to limitation of liability of governmental entities which require its employees to work during a declared state of emergency. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 489 REJECT (#649) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 489 FINAL PASSAGE (#553) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 489 FINAL PASSAGE (#211) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 489 FINAL PASSAGE (#553) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 489 FINAL PASSAGE (#211) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2020-06-01 | House | House conferees appointed: Pressly, Gregory Miller, and Wright. |
2020-06-01 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: McMath, Robert Mills, and Harris. |
2020-05-31 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2020-05-29 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20. |
2020-05-26 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |