LA SB489 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the delivery of alcoholic beverages. (8/1/18)
Title
Provides relative to the delivery of alcoholic beverages. (8/1/18)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Morrish [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 489 FINAL PASSAGE (#453) (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2018-04-23 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 23 yeas and 11 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Substitute for Senate Bill No. 246. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |