LA SB482 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for public records involving the security of the governor or his family and recommendations by which governmental decisions and policies are formulated. (8/1/24)
Title
Provides for public records involving the security of the governor or his family and recommendations by which governmental decisions and policies are formulated. (8/1/24)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |