LA SB481 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-11)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to students impacted due to the COVID-19 public health emergency. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to students impacted due to the COVID-19 public health emergency. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 481 CONCUR (#623) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 481 FINAL PASSAGE (#512) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 481 CO-AUTHORS (#125) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 481 FINAL PASSAGE (#124) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11SenateEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-06-11SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 245.
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-31SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-29SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-05-28SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2020-05-28HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/28/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-20HouseReported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-13HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-05-11SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-07SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-04SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-03-31SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB481&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168179
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170271
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171275
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178043
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182302
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169919
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170709
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174360
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176971
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168181
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170671
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171397
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180770
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171227
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171228
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176810
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177938

Bill Comments

feedback