LA SB477 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to business interruption insurance. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to business interruption insurance. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 477 FINAL PASSAGE (#246) (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-20HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2020-05-19SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 4 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-14SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-04SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2020-03-31SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback