LA SB47 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for certain probation fees paid into the Sex Offender Registry Technology Fund. (8/15/10) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides for certain probation fees paid into the Sex Offender Registry Technology Fund. (8/15/10) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. A.G. Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 47, CONCUR (#1703) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 47, FINAL PASSAGE (#1534) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 47, FINAL PASSAGE (#567) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 47, FINAL PASSAGE (#1534) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 47, FINAL PASSAGE (#567) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Effective date 8/15/10. | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 760. | |
2010-06-18 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-17 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-16 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2010-06-15 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2010-06-15 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/15/2010. | |
2010-06-07 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-06-04 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-06-03 | Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-17 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-05-13 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-05-12 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-11 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-10 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Finance. | |
2010-03-08 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Finance. |