LA SB465 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date 5/30/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to student discipline. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to student discipline. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on SB 465 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1391) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 465 ADOPT (#1357) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 465 REJECT (#1270) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 465 FINAL PASSAGE (#1176) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 465 FINAL PASSAGE (#554) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30SenateEffective date 5/30/2018.
2018-05-30SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 600.
2018-05-18SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
2018-05-18HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-18SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-18SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2018-05-18HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2018-05-18HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2018-05-18HouseConference Committee report received.
2018-05-18SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
2018-05-17SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2018-05-17HouseHouse conferees appointed: Leger, Nancy Landry, and Thomas.
2018-05-17HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2018-05-17SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Bishop, Morrish, and Boudreaux.
2018-05-17HouseNotice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
2018-05-17SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
2018-05-16SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-05-16HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18.
2018-05-11HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-05-10HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-05-08HouseReported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-01HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-04-30HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-26SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-24SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-23SenateReported with amendments.
2018-03-20SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-03-19SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB465&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1076313
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088718
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090479
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099493
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103014
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088713
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090200
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094109
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093733
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096848
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098227
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1076314
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089790
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090545
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094104
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099248
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102478
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090455
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098045
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098457
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099283
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099430

Bill Comments

feedback