LA SB462 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Louisiana Inclusionary Zoning and Workforce Affordable Housing Act. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to the Louisiana Inclusionary Zoning and Workforce Affordable Housing Act. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 462 CONCUR (#1080) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Vote on SB 462 FINAL PASSAGE (#831) (Y: 61 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 462 FINAL PASSAGE (#313) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Vote on SB 462 FINAL PASSAGE (#831) (Y: 61 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 462 FINAL PASSAGE (#313) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-29 | House | Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules. (Hand delivered on 05/26/18.) |
2018-05-26 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 26 yeas and 11 nays. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-05-08 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 29. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/18. |
2018-05-07 | House | Notice given. |
2018-05-07 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/18. |
2018-04-23 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-19 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-18 | House | Reported favorably (11-4). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2018-04-10 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 11 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |