LA SB461 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Designates a portion of Louisiana Highway 117 as the "Caroline Dormon Memorial Highway". (8/1/18)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates a portion of Louisiana Highway 117 as the "Caroline Dormon Memorial Highway". (8/1/18)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - House Vote on SB 461 FINAL PASSAGE (#735) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 461 SB 461 BY LONG (#212) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateEffective date 8/1/2018.
2018-05-15SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 161.
2018-05-09SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-08HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-08SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-07SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2018-05-03HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-03HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/03/18.
2018-04-18HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-17HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-16HouseReported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-04HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2018-04-03HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-03SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-27SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-26SenateReported with amendments.
2018-03-14SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2018-03-13SenateRules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback