LA SB46 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Alzheimer's and Related Dementias Advisory Council within the Louisiana Department of Health. (gov sig) (EG1 SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the Alzheimer's and Related Dementias Advisory Council within the Louisiana Department of Health. (gov sig) (EG1 SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 46 CO-AUTHORS (#43) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 46 FINAL PASSAGE (#42) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 46 FINAL PASSAGE (#42) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-03-21 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-03-20 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |