LA SB455 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 6/18/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 6/18/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for broadband development and connectivity. (gov sig)
Title
Provides for broadband development and connectivity. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 455 CONCUR (#1366) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 455 FINAL PASSAGE (#1471) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 455 AMENDMENT # 5455 BY CREWS MOTION TO ADOPT (#1461) (Y: 38 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 455 FINAL PASSAGE (#482) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 455 FINAL PASSAGE (#1471) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 455 AMENDMENT # 5455 BY CREWS MOTION TO ADOPT (#1461) (Y: 38 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 455 FINAL PASSAGE (#482) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-18 | Senate | Effective date 6/18/2022. |
2022-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 760. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2022. |
2022-05-26 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-26 | House | Discharged from the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-05-24 | House | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-05-23 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-05-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2022-05-10 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |